Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.08.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
25.08.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
01.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
06.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.01.2023 | Change - representative | |
17.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.09.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
24.01.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
31.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.12.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |