Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023347330 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010893693 | 31.08.2020 | CN202010894090 | 31.08.2020 | WO2021CN101993 | 24.06.2021 | CN202010985188 | 18.09.2020 | CN202010885254 | 28.08.2020 | CN202010590434 | 24.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023531260 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010893693 | 31.08.2020 | CN202010894090 | 31.08.2020 | WO2021CN101993 | 24.06.2021 | CN202010985188 | 18.09.2020 | CN202010885254 | 28.08.2020 | CN202010590434 | 24.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114425420B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B | CN114425420 | 03.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010985188 | 18.09.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113830778B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2023 | B | CN113830778 | 24.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010590434 | 24.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4173704 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010893693 | 31.08.2020 | CN202010894090 | 31.08.2020 | WO2021CN101993 | 24.06.2021 | CN202010985188 | 18.09.2020 | CN202010885254 | 28.08.2020 | CN202010590434 | 24.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021259347 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010893693 | 31.08.2020 | CN202010894090 | 31.08.2020 | CN202010985188 | 18.09.2020 | CN202010885254 | 28.08.2020 | CN202010590434 | 24.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202200502 | 01.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010893693 | 31.08.2020 | CN202010894090 | 31.08.2020 | CN202010985188 | 18.09.2020 | CN202010885254 | 28.08.2020 | CN202010590434 | 24.06.2020 |