EP4173704 - ZSM-5/ß CORE-SHELL MOLECULAR SIEVE AND SYNTHESIS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation 22 Chaoyangmen North Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100728 / CN | For all designated states Research Institute Of Petroleum Processing, Sinopec 18 Xueyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Lei Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Wei Beijing 100083 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Peng Beijing 100083 / CN | 04 /
SONG, Haitao Beijing 100083 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Lixia Beijing 100083 / CN | 06 /
ZHOU, Xiang Beijing 100083 / CN | 07 /
ZHAO, Liuzhou Beijing 100083 / CN | 08 /
ZHENG, Xueguo Beijing 100083 / CN | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21829647.3 | 24.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021CN101993 | Priority number, date | CN202010590434 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010590434 | CN202010885254 | 28.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010885254 | CN202010894090 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010894090 | CN202010893693 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010893693 | CN202010985188 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010985188 | [2023/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021259347 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173704 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/06, B01J29/80, C01B39/02 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C01B39/023 (EP);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J29/40 (EP,US);
B01J29/7007 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP);
B01J35/397 (EP);
B01J35/40 (US);
B01J35/615 (US);
B01J35/617 (US);
B01J35/647 (US);
B01J37/04 (US);
B01J37/08 (US);
C01B39/026 (EP);
C01B39/38 (US);
B01J2229/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | ZSM-5/SS-KERN-SCHALEN-MOLEKULARSIEB UND SYNTHESE UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/18] | English: | ZSM-5/ß CORE-SHELL MOLECULAR SIEVE AND SYNTHESIS AND USE THEREOF | [2023/18] | French: | TAMIS MOLÉCULAIRE À NOYAU-ENVELOPPE ZSM-5/B ET SYNTHÈSE ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2023 | Translation filed | 17.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |