EP4175013 - SERVER AND EXTERNAL TERMINAL FOR DETERIORATION DEGREE DETERMINATION SYSTEM FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND DETERIORATION DEGREE DETERMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAI, Tomomi Kariya- city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Nobuo Kariya- city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hiroyasu Kariya- city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Katsuki Kariya- city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
MINABE, Yuya Kariya- city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21833602.2 | 15.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP22682 | Priority number, date | JP20200113171 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020113171 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022004357 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175013 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/48, H02J7/00, G01R31/392, G01R31/367, H01M10/42 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
G01R31/392 (EP,US);
G01R31/367 (EP);
G01R31/371 (EP,US);
G01R31/3842 (EP,US);
H01M10/42 (EP);
H01M10/48 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | H01M10/48, H02J7/00, G01R31/392 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | SERVER UND EXTERNES ENDGERÄT FÜR EIN SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES VERSCHLECHTERUNGSGRADES FÜR EINE SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES VERSCHLECHTERUNGSGRADES | [2023/18] | English: | SERVER AND EXTERNAL TERMINAL FOR DETERIORATION DEGREE DETERMINATION SYSTEM FOR SECONDARY BATTERY, AND DETERIORATION DEGREE DETERMINATION SYSTEM | [2023/18] | French: | SERVEUR ET TERMINAL EXTERNE POUR SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION DE DEGRÉ DE DÉTÉRIORATION DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION DE DEGRÉ DE DÉTÉRIORATION | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2022 | Translation filed | 27.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 17.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2015059933 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2017228103 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2019125482 (GS YUASA CORP); | [XYA]JP6555440B ; | [A]JP2020071070 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2012137456 |