Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
13.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
29.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
04.09.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
12.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.07.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
24.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |