Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024055810 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020134894 | 23.12.2020 | WO2021EP86721 | 20.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4268326 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020134894 | 23.12.2020 | WO2021EP86721 | 20.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022136233 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020134894 | 23.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102020134894 | 23.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020134894 | 23.12.2020 |