EP4268326 - PLUG, PLUG CONNECTOR SYSTEM, PLUG KIT, AND METHOD FOR THE FIELD TERMINATION OF A CABLE WITH A PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reichle & De-Massari AG Binzstrasse 32 8620 Wetzikon / CH | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERBER, Matthias 8630 Rüti ZH / CH | 02 /
HOFER, Bernhard 8307 Effretikon / CH | 03 /
ZURKIRCHEN, Marco 8608 Bubikon / CH | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21843618.6 | 20.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021EP86721 | Priority number, date | DE202010134894 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020134894 | [2023/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022136233 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268326 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/2433, H01R13/6593, H01R13/645, H01R13/56, H01R13/58, H01R13/6592 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H01R4/2433 (EP,US);
H01R13/6593 (EP,US);
H01R13/562 (EP);
H01R13/5808 (EP);
H01R13/5825 (EP);
H01R13/6456 (EP);
H01R13/6592 (EP);
H01R13/7175 (US);
H01R2201/04 (US);
H01R43/01 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | STECKER, STECKVERBINDERSYSTEM, STECKERKIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR FELDKONFEKTIONIERUNG EINES KABELS MIT EINEM STECKER | [2023/44] | English: | PLUG, PLUG CONNECTOR SYSTEM, PLUG KIT, AND METHOD FOR THE FIELD TERMINATION OF A CABLE WITH A PLUG | [2023/44] | French: | CONNECTEUR, SYSTÈME DE CONNECTEUR ENFICHABLE, ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION SUR LE TERRAIN D'UN CÂBLE AVEC UN CONNECTEUR | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 14.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011104934 (GUTTER DAVID HENRY [US], et al); | [X]US2018323550 (BRENNAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [XYI]US10490960 (WU KEI-WEI [TW]) |