EP4268527 - CLOUDIFIED MAC SCHEDULER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VMware LLC 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2023/44] | For all designated states VMware, Inc. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Yang Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
MISRA, Rakesh Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21851748.0 | 24.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021US65172 | Priority number, date | US202163157351P | 05.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163157351 P | US202163157600P | 05.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163157600 P | US202163176859P | 19.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163176859 P | US202163180627P | 27.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163180627 P | US202117384476 | 23.07.2021 Original published format: US202117384476 | US202117384475 | 23.07.2021 Original published format: US202117384475 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186883 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268527 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04B7/0452, H04B7/06 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04L41/122 (US);
G06F11/3006 (EP);
G06F11/3409 (EP,US);
G06F11/3466 (EP);
G06F30/331 (US);
G06F8/60 (US);
G06F9/3877 (US);
G06F9/4411 (US);
G06F9/45533 (US);
G06F9/45545 (US);
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06F9/4881 (US);
G06F9/5044 (EP);
G06F9/5077 (US);
G06F9/541 (EP,US);
G06F9/544 (US);
G06F9/546 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
H04B7/0452 (US);
H04L41/40 (EP,US);
H04L41/5054 (EP);
H04L43/10 (US);
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04L67/125 (EP);
H04L67/535 (EP);
H04L67/565 (EP);
H04L67/60 (EP);
H04L67/61 (EP);
H04L69/324 (US);
H04L69/40 (EP);
H04W12/037 (US);
H04W12/08 (US);
H04W28/06 (US);
H04W28/0865 (EP,US);
H04W28/16 (US);
H04W40/246 (EP,US);
H04W48/14 (US);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/046 (US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W72/29 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W72/52 (US);
H04W72/542 (EP);
H04W8/18 (US);
H04W8/186 (US);
H04W8/20 (US);
G06F2009/4557 (US);
G06F2009/45579 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45583 (US);
G06F2009/45595 (US);
G06F2209/548 (US);
H04B7/0634 (EP);
H04L2212/00 (US);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W36/10 (US);
H04W72/121 (EP);
H04W84/042 (US);
H04W88/085 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | CLOUDIFIZIERTER MAC-PLANER | [2023/44] | English: | CLOUDIFIED MAC SCHEDULER | [2023/44] | French: | ORDONNANCEUR MAC NUAGISÉ | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 23.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2020106536 (BEDEKAR ANAND [US]); | [YA]US2021037390 (TOFIGHBAKHSH MOSTAFA [US], et al); | [XY]US2021051490 (YANOVER VLADIMIR [IL], et al) | by applicant | US20000631576 | US19590631768 |