EP4187996 - PASSIVE INTER-MODULATION SOURCE POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Zhi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HUO, Qiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Jinglun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Xi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
ZOU, Zhiqiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21857287.3 | 04.06.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021CN98454 | Priority number, date | CN202010843094 | 20.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010843094 | [2023/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022037188 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187996 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H04B7/0456, H04B17/17, G01S13/76, H04B1/10, H04W24/08 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/0456 (EP,CN,US);
H04W64/00 (CN,US);
G01S13/75 (US);
G01S13/765 (EP);
H04B1/10 (EP);
H04B17/17 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
G01S7/0236 (EP);
H04B1/1027 (EP);
H04B17/318 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | H04W64/00, H04B7/0456 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PASSIVEN POSITIONIERUNG EINER INTERMODULATIONSQUELLE | [2023/22] | English: | PASSIVE INTER-MODULATION SOURCE POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT DE SOURCE D'INTERMODULATION PASSIVE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2023 | Translation filed | 24.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015358144 (FLEISCHER MARKO [DE], et al) [X] 1,10-12 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0098] *[I] 2-9; | [XI]US2018359048 (STEPHENNE ALEX [CA]) [X] 1,10-12 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] * [I] 2-9 | International search | [A]CN1870473 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2018248576 (COE PETER [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2018332487 (BECK ANDREW E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [X]CN111521897 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA NORMAL) [X] 1, 9, 10, 18-20 * description, paragraphs [0042]-[0051] *; | [A] - HUAWEI, "Consideration of the Radiation Performance of BS Systems", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG4 Meeting #59; R4-112765, (20110516), vol. RAN WG4, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP009534512 [A] 1-20 * entire document * |