Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
25.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
02.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
01.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.02.2023 | Change - representative | |
13.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.12.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
25.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.02.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |