EP4206320 - METHOD OF CULTURING HUMAN INDUCED PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS, CULTURE OF HUMAN INDUCED PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING CEREBRAL ORGANOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | For all designated states Keio University 15-45, Mita 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8345 / JP | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAMINE, Hayato Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 02 /
SHIOZAWA, Seiji Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 03 /
OKANO, Hideyuki Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 04 /
ISHIKAWA, Mitsuru Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21858393.8 | 20.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021JP30516 | Priority number, date | JP20200140133 | 21.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020140133 | [2023/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022039250 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4206320 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/074, C12M3/00, C12N5/079, C12P7/44, C12P13/08, C12P13/24, C12P17/10, C12P19/32 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
C12M23/10 (EP);
C12N5/0623 (US);
C12N5/0618 (EP);
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
C12P13/04 (EP);
C12P13/08 (EP);
C12P17/12 (EP);
C12P19/30 (EP);
C12P19/32 (US);
C12P7/24 (EP);
C12N2501/15 (US);
C12N2501/155 (US);
C12N2501/415 (US);
C12N2501/727 (EP,US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON MENSCHLICHEN INDUZIERTEN PLURIPOTENTEN STAMMZELLEN, KULTUR VON MENSCHLICHEN INDUZIERTEN PLURIPOTENTEN STAMMZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZEREBRALEN ORGANOIDEN | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD OF CULTURING HUMAN INDUCED PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS, CULTURE OF HUMAN INDUCED PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING CEREBRAL ORGANOIDS | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES INDUITES HUMAINES, CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES INDUITES HUMAINES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ORGANOÏDES CÉRÉBRAUX | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2023 | Translation filed | 13.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2012518415 ; | [A]US2014227736 (NELSON TIMOTHY J [US], et al); | [YX]JP2017501743 ; | [A]JP2018506290 ; | [AY]JP2018531011 ; | [A]WO2020135199 (HELP STEM CELL INNOVATIONS CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | US2016289635 | US10407664 |