Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4199948
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.09.2024 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
17.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
20.10.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
04.10.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.09.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2023 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
26.05.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
01.05.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
24.02.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2023 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
25.02.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|