EP4199948 - MODIFIED SERINE PROTEASE PROPROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onchilles Pharma, Inc. 9880 Campus Point Drive, Suite 420 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5801 South Ellis Avenue Chicago Illinois 60637 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Lev Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | 02 /
NASOFF, Marc Chicago, Illinois 60615 / US | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21859037.0 | 18.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021US46467 | Priority number, date | US202063067059P | 18.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063067059 P | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022040288 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199948 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C12N9/00, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/52, C12N9/64, A61P35/00 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/6424 (KR);
C12N9/6448 (EP,US);
A61K38/482 (KR);
C12Y304/21036 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y304/24065 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (KR);
C07K2319/21 (EP,KR);
C07K2319/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | A61K38/00, C12N9/00, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE SERINPROTEASE-PROPROTEINE | [2023/26] | English: | MODIFIED SERINE PROTEASE PROPROTEINS | [2023/26] | French: | PROPROTÉINES DE SÉRINE PROTÉASE MODIFIÉE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 03.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015166974 (FRANANO F NICHOLAS [US], et al); | [A]US9291630 (WEZEMAN RACHEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2018134789 (BAEUERLE PATRICK [DE], et al); | [A]WO2019222762 (CHILDRENS NAT MEDICAL CT [US]) |