EP4215556 - LIQUID HYDROGENATED NITRILE-BUTADIENE RUBBER, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zannan Scitech Co., Ltd. 133-99 Guangzhong Rd, Minhang District Shanghai 201104 / CN | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAN, Zheng-Yun James Shanghai 201104 / CN | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Biggi, Cristina Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21868670.7 | 16.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021CN118659 | Priority number, date | CN202010975532 | 16.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010975532 | [2023/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022057848 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215556 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08F236/12, C08F8/04 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
C08C19/02 (EP,US);
C08L15/005 (US);
B01J31/2217 (US);
B01J31/2278 (US);
C07F15/0046 (US);
C08C19/08 (US);
C08K13/04 (US);
B01J2231/005 (US);
B01J2231/645 (US);
B01J2531/821 (US);
C08K2003/222 (US);
C08K2201/014 (US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08K5/18 (US);
C08L2201/08 (US);
C08L2207/324 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L15/005 (EP);
C08K3/36, C08L15/005 (EP);
C08K5/09, C08L15/005 (EP);
C08K5/14, C08L15/005 (EP);
C08K5/18, C08L15/005 (EP);
C08K5/3415, C08L15/005 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGER HYDRIERTER NITRILBUTADIENKAUTSCHUK, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/30] | English: | LIQUID HYDROGENATED NITRILE-BUTADIENE RUBBER, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF | [2023/30] | French: | CAOUTCHOUC NITRILE-BUTADIÈNE HYDROGÉNÉ LIQUIDE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2023 | Translation filed | 22.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP2473279 (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,2 * ex 1-7 *[A] 3-10; | [XI]EP2768866 (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 3-10 * ex 5-6 table 4, par 195 cat 2b * [I] 1,2; | [XI]US9346908 (HSIEH FENG-MING [TW], et al) [X] 3-10 * table 1-4, ex 4-6 * [I] 1,2; | [XI]WO2019110658 (ARLANXEO DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 3-10 * ex 7b, 8b, 12, 16, table 1 * [I] 1,2 |