Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
05.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
05.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
18.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.08.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
04.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
08.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.05.2023 | New entry: Fee payment for validation state | |
05.05.2023 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
03.05.2023 | Change - representative | |
03.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.06.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
07.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.05.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |