EP4236939 - CRYSTALLINE AND AMORPHOUS FORMS OF A DELTA-OPIOID MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trevena, Inc. 955 Chesterbrook Blvd, Suite 110 Chesterbrook, PA 19087 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLLARD, Victoria Edinburgh Technopole Milton Bridge EH26 0BE / GB | 02 /
ALLAN, Laura E. N. Edinburgh Technopole Milton Bridge EH26 0BE / GB | 03 /
REECE, Hayley Edinburgh Technopole Milton Bridge EH26 0BE / GB | 04 /
KOESTLER, Patrick Chesterbrook, Pennsylvania 19087 / US | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21887402.2 | 27.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021US56764 | Priority number, date | US202063106202P | 27.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063106202 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022093904 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236939 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, A61K31/4035, A61K31/445, A61K31/44, A61P25/06, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61K31/454, A61K45/06 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (US);
A61P25/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | A61K31/4035, A61K31/445, A61K31/44, A61P25/06, A61P25/16, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Extension states | BA | 03.05.2023 | ME | 03.05.2023 | Validation states | KH | 03.05.2023 | MA | 03.05.2023 | MD | 03.05.2023 | TN | 03.05.2023 | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE UND AMORPHE FORMEN EINES DELTA-OPIOID-MODULATORS | [2023/36] | English: | CRYSTALLINE AND AMORPHOUS FORMS OF A DELTA-OPIOID MODULATOR | [2023/36] | French: | FORMES CRISTALLINES ET AMORPHES D'UN MODULATEUR DELTA-OPIOÏDE | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2017210725 (SPEERSCHNEIDER AIMEE CROMBIE [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO2005051916 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2007039264 (SB PHARMCO INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008139484 (R L FINE CHEM [IN], et al); | [A]US9168254 (CORSON DONALD T [US], et al); | [XYA]US2017210725 (SPEERSCHNEIDER AIMEE CROMBIE [US], et al); | [A]WO2019079540 (EPIZYME INC [US]) |