EP4067020 - BLADE UNIT AND ELECTRIC RAZOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komori, Shunsuke Osaka / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Toshiharu Osaka / JP | 03 /
Okura, Shoki Osaka / JP | 04 /
Ikemoto, Atsutaka Osaka / JP | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22152224.6 | 19.01.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | JP20210058840 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021058840 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067020 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/10 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B26B19/10 (EP,US);
B26B19/42 (CN);
B26B19/04 (CN);
B26B19/28 (CN);
B26B19/3813 (US);
B26B19/3846 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLINGENEINHEIT UND ELEKTRISCHER RASIERER | [2022/40] | English: | BLADE UNIT AND ELECTRIC RAZOR | [2022/40] | French: | UNITÉ DE LAME ET RASOIR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19722149 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0951970 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]EP1930136 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2010136954 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2014103210 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH11267376 |