Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11745367 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2023 | B2 | US2022314473 | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021058840 | 30.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022155383 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021058840 | 30.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115139347 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021058840 | 30.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4067020 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021058840 | 30.03.2021 |