EP4245287 - PROCESS FOR MAKING A SKINCARE PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dacheng Filter Materials Co., Ltd. 18F., No. 258, Sec. 2, Jincheng Rd. Tucheng Dist. New Taipei City 236 / TW | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEN, YI-HSUAN 236 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
CHEN, WAN-CHI 236 New Taipei City / TW | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 22162681.5 | 17.03.2022 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245287 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, D01D5/00, D04H1/728, A61Q19/00 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
A61K8/0212 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
D01D1/02 (EP);
D01D5/0038 (EP);
D01F1/10 (EP);
D04H1/728 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HAUTPFLEGEPRODUKTS | [2023/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING A SKINCARE PRODUCT | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT DE SOINS POUR LA PEAU | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 12.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009031620 (TAIYOKAGAKU CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 1 * * example 19 *; | [X]WO2014142675 (ACTIVE FIBRES LTD [NZ]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 1, lines 23-26 * * example 2 * * claim 24 *; | [X]US2017340090 (KIM CHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0079] * * example 1 *; | [X]WO2019184839 (XYBER FORCE TECH COMPANY LIMITED [CN]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0030] *; | [A]WO2021069952 (THE STELLENBOSCH NANOFIBER COMPANY PTY LTD [ZA]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]US2021177708 (XIAO JUNYONG [CN], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 1 * * column 8; example 1 *; | [X]WO2021178260 (ELC MAN LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 1, lines 27-31 * * formula 3; page 26; table 3 * * claim 2 * | by applicant | JP3215852B |