EP4122332 - ARTICLE FOR USE IN APPARATUS FOR HEATING SMOKABLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGLAND, Will London / GB | 02 /
WOODMAN, Tom London / GB | 03 /
PHILLIPS, Jeremy London / GB | 04 /
GOMEZ, Pablo Javier Ballesteros Romsey / GB | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Philip Mark, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 22163685.5 | 19.05.2017 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | GB20160008928 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: GB 201608928 | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122332 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/20, A24D3/04, A24D3/17, // A24D1/02 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
A24D3/17 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/00 (RU);
A24D1/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A24F1/12 (US);
A24D1/027 (KR,US);
A24D1/04 (CN,KR);
A24D3/0279 (KR);
A24D3/043 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/10 (KR,US);
A24F40/20 (CN,KR);
A24F40/40 (CN,KR);
A24F40/46 (CN,KR);
A24F2700/03 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ARTIKEL ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHITZUNG VON RAUCHBAREM MATERIAL | [2023/04] | English: | ARTICLE FOR USE IN APPARATUS FOR HEATING SMOKABLE MATERIAL | [2023/04] | French: | ARTICLE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE DE MATÉRIAU À FUMER | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 25.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17728783.6 / EP3457874 | EP20151255.5 / EP3666091 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0053037 (AMERICAN FILTRONA CORP [GB], et al); | [X]WO2014158051 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [X]EP2789248 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [X]CN104921296 (CHINA TOBACCO YUNNAN IND CO LTD) |