Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.07.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
28.07.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
28.07.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
26.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
30.03.2022 | Change - representative | |
30.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |