Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024196965 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | US202318532143 | 07.12.2023 | US201816302690 | 19.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019116874 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240064006 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | KR20217038858 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102662174B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2024 | B1 | KR20210148416 | 07.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | KR20197029261 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102464393B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2022 | B1 | KR20190116572 | 14.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | KR20187021106 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102031307B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2019 | B1 | KR20180095080 | 24.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102030819B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2019 | B1 | KR20180090897 | 13.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023116790 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | JP2022065641 | 12.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7420452B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2024 | B2 | JP2022095868 | 28.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | JP2020031893 | 27.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7131874B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B2 | JP2019523639 | 29.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3666091 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | B1 | EP3666091 | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | EP17728783 | 19.05.2017 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3457874 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2020 | B1 | EP3457874 | 27.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113749288 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | CN201780030996 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109414058B | Global Dossier | 15.10.2021 | B | CN109414058 | 01.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3097715 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2023 | C | CA3097715 | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | CA3024764 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3024764 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021204752B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2023 | B2 | AU2021204752 | 05.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | AU2021204752 | 07.07.2021 | AU2017267294 | 19.05.2017 | AU2020201368 | 25.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020201368B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2021 | B2 | AU2020201368 | 12.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | AU2017267294 | 19.05.2017 | AU2020201368 | 25.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017267294B | Global Dossier | 28.11.2019 | B2 | AU2017267294 | 29.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4122332 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | EP17728783 | 19.05.2017 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | EP20151255 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018073462 | 02.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2797980T | 04.12.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018014161 | 20.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY189397 | 09.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | EP17062146 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ748330 | 29.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12018502420 | 30.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3457874T | 16.11.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | EP17728783 | 19.05.2017 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2718468 | 08.04.2020 | C1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA125850 | 22.06.2022 | C2 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP62146 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017198837 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7144067B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2022 | B2 | JP2020110155 | 27.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR108511 | 29.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2018003259 | 03.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2021000869 | 08.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2968970T | 14.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201608928D0 | 06.07.2016 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE049534T | 28.10.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE065231T | 28.05.2024 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3666091T | 25.01.2024 | T | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3666091T | 18.03.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3666091T | 17.01.2024 | T | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2730481 | 24.08.2020 | C2 | RU2020107546 | 27.05.2020 | A3 | RU2020107546 | 30.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2762661 | 21.12.2021 | C1 | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI732868B | 11.07.2021 | B | TW201742553 | 16.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201608928 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Earlier application | EP3457874 | EP3666091 |