Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.01.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
13.01.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.10.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
13.04.2022 | Change - representative |