Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022365707 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117366017 | 01.07.2021 | US202163187919 | 12.05.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220154034 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117366017 | 01.07.2021 | US202163187919 | 12.05.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115346592 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117366017 | 01.07.2021 | US202163187919 | 12.05.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4089542 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117366017 | 01.07.2021 | US202163187919 | 12.05.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202244737 | 16.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117366017 | 01.07.2021 | US202163187919 | 12.05.2021 |