Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
23.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
22.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.11.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
06.05.2022 | Change - representative |