Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12089001 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2024 | B2 | US2022400335 | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021206011 | 14.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4106348 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021206011 | 14.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN218587332U | 07.03.2023 | U | Priority number | Date | DE102021206011 | 14.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021206011 | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021206011 | 14.06.2021 |