EP4102311 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ADAPTIVE LEARNING OF MODELS IN MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Kuldeep 411028 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
NISTALA, Sri Harsha 411028 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
RUNKANA, Venkataramana 411028 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22173146.6 | 13.05.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | IN202121026063 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: IN202121026063 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102311 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4102311 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02, G05B17/02 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
G05B13/0265 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
G05B17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ADAPTIVEN LERNEN VON MODELLEN IN FERTIGUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2022/50] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ADAPTIVE LEARNING OF MODELS IN MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS | [2022/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'APPRENTISSAGE ADAPTATIF DE MODÈLES DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE FABRICATION | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 25.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 24.01.2024 | |
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 24.04.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 24.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020234899 (TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES [IN]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A] - ARRIOLA-RIOS VERONICA E. ET AL, "Modeling of Deformable Objects for Robotic Manipulation: A Tutorial and Review", FRONTIERS IN ROBOTICS AND AI, (20200917), vol. 7, doi:10.3389/frobt.2020.00082, XP055960625 [A] 1-15 * page 16, column left, paragraph third - page 17, column left, paragraph second; figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/frobt.2020.00082 |