EP4102311 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ADAPTIVE LEARNING OF MODELS IN MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 23.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Kuldeep 411028 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
NISTALA, Sri Harsha 411028 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
RUNKANA, Venkataramana 411028 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22173146.6 | 13.05.2022 | [2022/50] | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 24.01.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/09] | 30.01.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/09] | 30.01.2024 | Date of registration [2024/09] | 24.01.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/09] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 30.01.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/09] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4102311 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 03 |