EP4131368 - PLASTIC MODULE HOUSING WITH EMBEDDED HEAT SINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singer, Michael 95671 Bärnau / DE | 02 /
Küpfer, Oliver 91322 Gräfenberg / DE | 03 /
Schober, Thomas 92256 Hahnbach / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 22186872.2 | 26.07.2022 | [2023/06] | Priority number, date | DE202110208578 | 06.08.2021 Original published format: DE102021208578 | [2023/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131368 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/40, H05K7/20 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H05K7/20854 (EP,US);
H01L23/4006 (EP);
H05K7/20409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULGEHÄUSE AUS KUNSTSTOFF MIT EINGEBETTETEM KÜHLKÖRPER | [2023/06] | English: | PLASTIC MODULE HOUSING WITH EMBEDDED HEAT SINK | [2023/06] | French: | BOÎTIER MODULAIRE EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE POURVU DE DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE INCORPORÉ | [2023/06] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 14.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1006766 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [IA]EP2175708 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]); | [A]DE202017104164U (EKL AG [DE]) |