Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
23.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.02.2024 | First examination report | |
25.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
25.09.2023 | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.09.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.02.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
03.02.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
23.08.2022 | Change - representative |