Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.08.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
24.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
24.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
29.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.10.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] |
06.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
06.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] |
10.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
01.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.09.2022 | Change - representative |