Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023354255 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217933226 | 19.09.2022 | US202263337179 | 02.05.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230154731 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202263337179 | 02.05.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4274267 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202263337179 | 02.05.2022 |