EP4274267 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HEIGHT-BASED LOCATION UPDATE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Myoungsoo Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Sunghoon Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hongsuk Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22196924.9 | 21.09.2022 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | US202263337179P | 02.05.2022 Original published format: US 202263337179 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274267 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/029, H04W60/04 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04W4/029 (EP,KR);
H04W64/00 (KR);
H04W64/003 (US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W4/025 (KR);
H04W48/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HÖHENBASIERTEN STANDORTAKTUALISIERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HEIGHT-BASED LOCATION UPDATE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MISE À JOUR DE LOCALISATION BASÉE SUR LA HAUTEUR DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2021022054 (TSUDA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100]; figure 9 *; | [XI]WO2021134496 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0125]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5-13; | US2022330051 [ ] (PENG WENJIE [CN], et al) |