Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
08.08.2023 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.05.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.04.2023 | First examination report | |
31.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
31.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
26.10.2022 | Change - representative |