Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11859149 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2024 | B2 | US2023140105 | 04.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21205659 | 29.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230062402 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21205659 | 29.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023067818 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21205659 | 29.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116064182 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21205659 | 29.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3180270 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21205659 | 29.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4174152 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21205659 | 29.10.2021 |