EP4174152 - IONIC LIQUID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREER, Adam Abingdon, OX13 6BB / GB | 02 /
HARDACRE, Christopher Manchester, M13 9PL / GB | 03 /
COULTAS, David Abingdon, OX13 6BB / GB | 04 /
IRVING, Matthew Abingdon, OX13 6BB / GB | 05 /
HOLLINGSWORTH, Nathan Abingdon, OX13 6BB / GB | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Hart, Richard Joseph, et al PO Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22203792.1 | 26.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | EP20210205659 | 29.10.2021 Original published format: EP 21205659 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174152 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C10M133/06, C10M137/12, C10M169/04, C10M171/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C10M137/12 (EP,KR,US);
C10M129/50 (KR);
C10M141/10 (CN);
C09K15/08 (KR);
C09K15/322 (KR);
C10M129/54 (KR);
C10M133/06 (EP);
C10M169/04 (EP,CN,US);
C10M171/00 (EP);
C10M2203/003 (US);
C10M2207/144 (CN);
C10M2223/06 (CN,US);
C10N2030/06 (CN,KR,US);
C10N2030/10 (KR);
C10N2030/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/18] | English: | IONIC LIQUID COMPOSITION | [2023/18] | French: | COMPOSITION LIQUIDE IONIQUE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US3024195 | US3087936 | US3113986 | US3154560 | US3172892 | US3202678 | US3254025 | USRE27145E | US3634595 | US3670054 | US3700633 | WO2008075016 | US2008251759 | EP2090642 | US2010187481 | US8278253 | WO2013158473 |