EP4209156 - GRINDING UNIT FOR BEVERAGE PREPARATION DEVICE WITH IMPROVED GRINDING DEGREE ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eugster/Frismag AG Fehlwiesstrasse 14 8580 Amriswil / CH | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eberle, Rainer 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behrmann Wagner PartG mbB Hegau-Tower Maggistraße 5 (11. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 22208149.9 | 17.11.2022 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | DE202210100392 | 10.01.2022 Original published format: DE102022100392 | [2023/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209156 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47J42/08, A47J42/18, // A47J31/44 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A47J42/08 (EP);
A47J42/18 (EP);
A47J31/4403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAHLEINHEIT FÜR GETRÄNKEZUBEREITUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTER MAHLGRADVERSTELLUNG | [2023/28] | English: | GRINDING UNIT FOR BEVERAGE PREPARATION DEVICE WITH IMPROVED GRINDING DEGREE ADJUSTMENT | [2023/28] | French: | UNITÉ DE BROYAGE POUR DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS AVEC RÉGLAGE AMÉLIORÉ DU DEGRÉ DE BROYAGE | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 12.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0992208 (ZYLISS AG [CH]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [XAI]DE112015002922 (GEFU KUECHENBOSS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * [A] 11 [I] 8,10; | [XPA]EP3964107 (MELITTA EUROPA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] * [A] 10 |