Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
20.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
02.12.2022 | Change - representative |