Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024182295 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP22210906 | 01.12.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240082224 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | EP22210906 | 01.12.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118138972 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | EP22210906 | 01.12.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4378881 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP22210906 | 01.12.2022 |