EP4152784 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE-ROAD COLLABORATION, VEHICLE INTELLIGENT TERMINAL, AND CLOUD CONTROL PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Intelligent Connectivity (Beijing) Technology Co., Ltd. 101, 1st floor, building 1, yard 7 Ruihe West 2nd Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kun BEIJING, 100176 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhuhua BEIJING, 100176 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Nanke BEIJING, 100176 / CN | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22216986.4 | 28.12.2022 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | CN202111626106 | 28.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111626106 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4152784 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4152784 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/00, H04W12/63, H04W4/44, H04W4/021, H04W12/086, H04W12/76, H04L67/12 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04W4/44 (EP,US);
G08G1/0104 (KR);
B60W60/001 (US);
G08G1/0967 (KR);
G08G1/096725 (EP);
G08G1/096775 (EP);
G08G1/164 (EP);
G08G1/166 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L67/289 (KR);
H04L67/50 (KR);
H04W12/009 (EP);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/086 (EP);
H04W12/63 (EP);
H04W12/76 (EP);
H04W4/021 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/40 (KR);
B60W2556/45 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | H04W4/44, H04W4/021 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR FAHRZEUG-STRASSEN-KOLLABORATION, INTELLIGENTES FAHRZEUGENDGERÄT UND CLOUD-STEUERPLATTFORM | [2023/12] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE-ROAD COLLABORATION, VEHICLE INTELLIGENT TERMINAL, AND CLOUD CONTROL PLATFORM | [2023/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COLLABORATION VÉHICULE-ROUTE, TERMINAL INTELLIGENT DE VÉHICULE ET PLATEFORME DE COMMANDE EN NUAGE | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/20] | 10.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2020200686 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-7,14-16,18-29 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 24 * * page 10, line 15 - page 73, line 2 * * figures 1-25 * [A] 8-13,17; | [IA]US2021006972 (GUIM BERNAT FRANCESC [ES], et al) [I] 1-7,14-16,18-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0235] * * figures 1-16 *[A] 8-13,17; | [XAI]US2021144517 (GUIM BERNAT FRANCESC [ES], et al) [X] 1,5,16,20-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [1314] * * figures 1-83 * * paragraph [0239] * * paragraph [0387] * * paragraph [0397] * * paragraph [0458] * * paragraph [0467] * * paragraph [0727] * * paragraph [0820] * * paragraph [1201] * * paragraph [1215] * * paragraph [0988] * * paragraph [1204] * [A] 8-13,17 [I] 2-4,6,7,14,15,18,19; | [IA]CN113271543 (APOLLO ZHILIAN BEIJING TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-7,14-16,18-29 * the whole document * [A] 8-13,17; | [P]EP4037347 (APOLLO INTELLIGENT CONNECTIVITY BEIJING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0128] * * figures 1-10 * |