EP4227228 - VERTICAL PACKAGING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulma Packaging, S.Coop. Barrio Garibai, 28 20560 Oñati / ES | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTXOA-AIZPURUA CALVO, Alberto 20560 OÑATI / ES | 02 /
IZQUIERDO EREÑO, Eneko 20560 OÑATI / ES | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Igartua, Ismael Galbaian S. Coop. Garaia Parke Teknologikoa Goiru Kalea 1 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón / ES | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 22382111.7 | 10.02.2022 | [2023/33] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4227228 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4227228 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/207, B65B9/213, B65B39/00, B65G69/16 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
B65B9/213 (EP,IL);
B65B5/061 (IL);
B65B37/005 (IL,US);
B65B39/00 (IL);
B65B39/007 (EP,IL,US);
B65B9/207 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | VERTIKALE VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE | [2023/33] | English: | VERTICAL PACKAGING MACHINE | [2023/33] | French: | MACHINE DE CONDITIONNEMENT VERTICAL | [2023/33] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4722373 (ROOVERS GIJSBERTUS C F [NL]); | [A]EP1184282 (PFM SPA [IT]) | by applicant | US4722373 |