EP4321068 - BOILER FOR COFFEE VENDING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jofemar, S.A. Ctra. Marcilla, km. 2 31350 Peralta (Navarra) / ES | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUINDULAIN VIDONDO, Jesús 31350 Peralta (Navarra) / ES | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22382766.8 | 08.08.2022 | [2024/07] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321068 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/54 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
A47J31/542 (EP,US);
F24H1/0018 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/37] |
Former [2024/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOILER FÜR KAFFEEVERKAUFSAUTOMATEN | [2024/07] | English: | BOILER FOR COFFEE VENDING MACHINES | [2024/07] | French: | CHAUDIÈRE POUR MACHINES DE VENTE DE CAFÉ | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/37] | 02.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6442341 (WU CHIA-HSIUNG [TW]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XI]WO2008044180 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,10 * page 5, line 26 - page 8, line 34; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,4-9,11-14; | [A]DE10317353 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP2429357 |