Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
16.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.12.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2023 | Change - representative | |
04.12.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.11.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
06.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |