Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024128567 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021111863 | 06.05.2021 | WO2022EP61159 | 27.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117597821 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102021111863 | 06.05.2021 | WO2022EP61159 | 27.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4334997 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021111863 | 06.05.2021 | WO2022EP61159 | 27.04.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022233667 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021111863 | 06.05.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021111863 | 10.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102021111863 | 06.05.2021 |