EP4352918 - SECURELY AND RELIABLY TRANSMITTING MESSAGES BETWEEN NETWORK DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEL, Deepak Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
RAHIMI, Kambiz Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22726570.9 | 10.05.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022US28417 | Priority number, date | US202117341122 | 07.06.2021 Original published format: US202117341122 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022260799 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4352918 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L47/34 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H04L63/164 (EP);
H04L9/08 (US);
H04L47/34 (EP);
H04L63/0272 (EP);
H04L63/061 (EP);
H04L63/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | SICHERE UND ZUVERLÄSSIGE ÜBERTRAGUNG VON NACHRICHTEN ZWISCHEN NETZWERKVORRICHTUNGEN | [2024/16] | English: | SECURELY AND RELIABLY TRANSMITTING MESSAGES BETWEEN NETWORK DEVICES | [2024/16] | French: | TRANSMISSION SÉCURISÉE ET FIABLE DE MESSAGES ENTRE DISPOSITIFS DE RÉSEAU | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 25.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2014281530 (SONG JIFEI [US], et al); | [A]US2020099671 (SHAW ABHISEK KUMAR [IN], et al); |