Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024245716 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | US202217583805 | 25.01.2022 | US202318467985 | 15.09.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11793827 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2023 | B2 | US2022233567 | 28.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | US202217583805 | 25.01.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230132476 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024503723 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL304366 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116710465 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3202049 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022210781 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4281081 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023008004 | 13.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US13660 | 25.01.2022 | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022159872 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202245805 | 01.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202163141450 | 25.01.2021 |