EP4281081 - ADENOSINE DERIVATIVE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brii Biosciences, Inc. WeWork One City Ctr. Unit 05-130, 110 Corcoran St. Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Lianhong Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22743369.5 | 25.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022US13660 | Priority number, date | US202163141450P | 25.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163141450 P | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022159872 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281081 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7042, C07H19/16, A61P31/12, A61P31/18, A61K31/7076, A61K31/7052 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07H19/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | ADENOSINDERIVAT UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2023/48] | English: | ADENOSINE DERIVATIVE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING THE SAME | [2023/48] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'ADÉNOSINE ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 06.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018022221 (IVACHTCHENKO ALEXANDRE VASILIEVICH [US], et al); | [A]US2018099989 (IVACHTCHENKO ALEXANDRE VASILIEVICH [US], et al); | [A]US2020079814 (IVACHTCHENKO ALEXANDRE VASILIEVICH [US], et al); |