EP4359779 - THERMAL FLUID SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLUSSO LIMITED Unit 1, Cambridge House Camboro Business Park Oakington Road Girton Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0QH / GB | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALI, Syed Zeeshan Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 2FY / GB | 02 /
LEE, Cerdin Trumpington Cambridgeshire CB2 9EX / GB | 03 /
GARDNER, Ethan Kineton Warwickshire CV35 0LA / GB | 04 /
HARDIE, Jonathan Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0DL / GB | 05 /
CALLAN, Jon Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0DL / GB | 06 /
UDREA, Florin Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 0RB / GB | 07 /
POPA, Daniel Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 3AP / GB | 08 /
FALCO, Claudio Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 2RD / GB | 09 /
GARDNER, Julian William Kineton Warwickshire CV35 0LA / GB | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22755074.6 | 22.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022EP67036 | Priority number, date | US202117354327 | 22.06.2021 Original published format: US202117354327 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022268889 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359779 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/18 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G01N25/18 (EP,US);
G01M3/04 (US);
G01N1/44 (US);
G01N25/00 (US);
G01N25/48 (US);
G01N25/4873 (US);
G01N25/4893 (US);
G01N27/04 (US);
G01N27/22 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | THERMISCHER FLUIDSENSOR | [2024/18] | English: | THERMAL FLUID SENSOR | [2024/18] | French: | CAPTEUR DE FLUIDE THERMIQUE | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 22.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005265422 (BONNE ULRICH [US]); | [Y]WO2014006648 (CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE RICERCHE [IT]); | [A]US2018292338 (LIU FANG [US], et al); | [Y]US2021116281 (UDREA FLORIN [GB], et al) | by applicant | US8667839 | US8689608 | US10408802 | US10598621 | US19790635722 |