Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024303952 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163157244 | 05.03.2021 | WO2022US19019 | 04.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4302278 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163157244 | 05.03.2021 | WO2022US19019 | 04.03.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022187703 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163157244 | 05.03.2021 |