EP4302278 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REAL-TIME VARIABLE RESOLUTION MICROSCOPE SLIDE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Administrators of The Tulane Educational Fund 1440 Canal Street 8432 New Orleans, Louisiana 70112 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHMAN, Kimberly Lorain New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Jonathon Quincy New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | 03 /
LICORISH, Cody Maurice New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | 04 /
SUMMA, Brian Mark New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | 05 /
WENK, Carola New Orleans, LA 70112 / DE | 06 /
ZHUGE, Huimin New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | 07 /
COOPER, Max, Sebastian New Orleans, LA 70112 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22764191.7 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US19019 | Priority number, date | US202163157244P | 05.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163157244 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022187703 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302278 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/69, G06V10/40 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G06V20/693 (EP);
G06V10/16 (US);
G02B21/0036 (US);
G02B21/008 (US);
G02B21/361 (US);
G02B21/367 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEIT-BILDGEBUNG VON MIKROSKOPOBJEKTTRÄGERN MIT VARIABLER AUFLÖSUNG | [2024/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REAL-TIME VARIABLE RESOLUTION MICROSCOPE SLIDE IMAGING | [2024/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE DE LAME DE MICROSCOPE À RÉSOLUTION VARIABLE EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6055097 (LANNI FREDERICK [US], et al); | [Y]US2005254696 (BACUS JAMES W [US], et al); | [Y]US2013329072 (ZHOU JIANPING [US], et al); | [YA]US2014270537 (LO HOK MAN HERMAN [CA], et al); | [YA]US2020162696 (KÜHM ANDREAS [DE], et al) |